ND 1058 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-06.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nonmoving violations; and to repeal section 39-10-51 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unattended motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unattended motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseSigned by Governor 04/08
2019-04-05HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President
2019-04-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0
2019-04-01HouseConcurred
2019-03-19HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-18SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-03-18SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-15SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2019-01-09SenateReceived from House
2019-01-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2019-01-07HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 0 5
2019-01-04HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback