ND 1057 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 14-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the confidentiality of property and debt listing information of the parties to a divorce.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The confidentiality of property and debt listing information of the parties to a divorce.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseSigned by Governor 03/29
2017-03-27HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-23SenateSigned by President
2017-03-22HouseReturned to House
2017-03-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2017-03-20SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-13SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 11
2017-01-13HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-12HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 2 0
2017-01-10HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback