ND 1056 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-02-08.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to application of the property tax credit for disabled veterans to properties placed in trust for a surviving spouse; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application of the property tax credit for disabled veterans to properties placed in trust for a surviving spouse; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 14 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 32
2017-03-22SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 36
2017-01-13HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-12HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
2017-01-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback