ND HB1055 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 61-16.1-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the aggregate total outstanding revenue bond indebtedness limit for water resource districts.
Title
The aggregate total outstanding revenue bond indebtedness limit for water resource districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Bert Anderson [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 13 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 16 |
2017-01-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 3 0 |
2017-01-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |