ND HB1053 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-52-02.9, subsection? 2 of section 54-52-05, and sections 54-52-06, 54-52.6-02, and 54-52.6-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to increased employer and employee contributions under the public employees retirement system defined benefit and defined contribution plans.
Title
Increased employer and employee contributions under the public employees retirement system defined benefit and defined contribution plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 90 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 15 0 6 |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |