ND HB1043 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 1-02-12, subsection 10 of section 11-31-03, subsection 1 of section 14-20-12, subsection 1 of section 15.1-21-02.1, section 24-02-30, subsection 1 of section 25-02-01.1, sections 50-06-06.2 and 52-10-04, subsection 4 of section 52-10-05, section 52-10-07, subsection 3 of section 54-44.7-03, subsection 17 of section 54-52-01, subsection 3 of section 54-52-05, sections 57-15-06 and 57-15-08, subsection 1 of section 57-34-03, subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3, section 57-51.1-03.1, and subsection 19 of section 58-03-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to technical corrections and improper, inaccurate, redundant, missing, or obsolete references; to repeal sections 54-40.3-03, 57-15-10.2, 57-38-01.29, and 57-38-01.30 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to obsolete provisions; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Obsolete provisions; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 0 |
2017-04-07 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-10 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2 |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |