ND HB1042 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 62.1-02-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of a loaded firearm in a vehicle; to amend and reenact subdivision l of subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 and subsection 4 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possessing a firearm or dangerous weapon in a church; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Possessing a firearm or dangerous weapon in a church; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3, Emergency clause carried |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-01-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |