ND HB1041 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 54-52-06, section 54-52.1-06, and subsection 2 of section 54-52.6-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employees retirement system penalties for late payments or failures to follow required processes; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Public employees retirement system penalties for late payments or failures to follow required processes; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 59 nays 31 |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2021-01-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |