ND 1041 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-32 and a new section to chapter 54-23.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to presumptive probation and faith-based organizations; to amend and reenact sections 12-44.1-32, 12-54.1-01, 12-59-08, 12.1-17-13, and 12.1-23-05, subdivision c of subsection 1 of section 12.1-32-02, subsection 2 of section 12.1-32-02, subsection 3 of section 12.1-32-07, section 19-03.1-22.3, subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-22.5, subsections 5 and 7 of section 19-03.1-23, subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-23.1, subdivision f of subsection 5 of section 39-08-01, subsection 2 of section 39-20-01, subsection 17 of section 50-06-05.1, and section 50-09-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sentence reduction credit, medical paroles, domestic violence offender treatment, grading of theft offenses, sentencing alternatives, credit for time spent in custody, terms and conditions of probation, controlled substances, and the supplemental nutrition assistance program; to provide a penalty; to provide for the creation of a pretrial services program pilot project within the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide a report to the legislative management; to provide for a report to the legislative assembly; to provide an appropriation; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentence reduction credit, medical paroles, domestic violence offender treatment, grading of theft offenses, sentencing alternatives, credit for time spent in custody, terms and conditions of probation, controlled substances, and the supplemental nutrition assistance program; to provide a penalty; to provide for the creation of a pretrial services program pilot project within the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide a report to the legislative management; to provide for a report to the legislative assembly; to provide an appropriation; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HouseSigned by Governor 04/21
2017-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-20SenateSigned by President
2017-04-18SenateEmergency clause carried
2017-04-18SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 0
2017-04-18SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-18SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-17HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-17HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-12SenateAppoint Sen. Osland to replace Sen. D. Larson on conference committee
2017-04-06SenateConference committee appointed Armstrong D. Larson Nelson
2017-04-05HouseConference committee appointed K. Koppelman Satrom M. Nelson
2017-04-05HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-03HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-30SenateEmergency clause carried
2017-03-30SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-30SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-29SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-28SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-03-24SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-03-24SenateAmendment adopted
2017-03-23SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 4
2017-02-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 4 1
2017-02-08HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2017-02-08HouseAmendment adopted
2017-02-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1
2017-01-31HouseCommittee Hearing 09:40
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1041.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-03008a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-05004a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-06000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-07000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-05016a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-08000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0197-09000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-35.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-58.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-69.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-70.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback