ND HB1039 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to hospital discharge policies.
Title
Hospital discharge policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 26 |
2017-01-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |