ND 1038 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Received from House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management legacy fund earnings committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management legacy fund earnings committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12SenateReceived from House
2021-01-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2021-01-08HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2021-01-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback