ND 1037 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 15.1-21-02.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to North Dakota scholarship information; and to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15.1-06-06 and section 15.1-07-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the approval of public schools and the student information system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The approval of public schools and the student information system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/13
2017-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-10SenateSigned by President
2017-04-07SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-06SenateReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2017-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-04-06HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-04HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2017-04-04SenateConference committee appointed Davison Schaible Vedaa
2017-03-31HouseConference committee appointed Zubke Longmuir Guggisberg
2017-03-31HouseRefused to concur
2017-03-30HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-03-27HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1
2017-03-23SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-01SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 3
2017-01-05HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-04HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback