ND 1036 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to repeal section 15-62.4-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the student financial assistance program advisory board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The student financial assistance program advisory board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23HouseSigned by Governor 03/22
2017-03-21HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-17SenateSigned by President
2017-03-16HouseReturned to House
2017-03-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-14SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-13SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 3
2017-01-05HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-04HouseCommittee Hearing 01:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback