ND HB1034 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 25-03.1-11, 25-03.1-17, 25-03.1-19, 25-03.1-26, 25-03.1-27, 25-03.1-30, 25-03.1-34, and 25-03.1-42 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to preliminary treatment and involuntary treatment hearings and references to an individual who is chemically dependent; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Preliminary treatment and involuntary treatment hearings and references to an individual who is chemically dependent; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2021-03-30 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2021-01-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |