ND HB1033 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an expanded service payments for elderly and disabled pilot project on intensive care coordination.
Title
An expanded service payments for elderly and disabled pilot project on intensive care coordination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9 |
2019-04-02 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |