ND HB1033 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-24.1-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cost-sharing under the Medicaid expansion program; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.
Title
Cost-sharing under the Medicaid expansion program; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 2 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 87 |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 17 0 4 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |