ND 1031 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-06-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization to purchase or lease aircraft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorization to purchase or lease aircraft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 43
2017-03-27SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
2017-03-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-01-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 5
2017-01-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-11HouseRereferred to Government and Veterans Affairs
2017-01-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback