ND HB1029 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 15.1-06-06.1, 15.1-06-06.2, and 15.1-06-06.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school approval; to amend and reenact sections 15.1-02-11, 15.1-06-06, 15.1-13-18, 15.1-13-19, and 15.1-13-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school approval; to repeal sections 15.1-27-08 and 15.1-27-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to payment reductions for unaccredited schools; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Payment reductions for unaccredited schools; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-13 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2011-04-12 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2011-04-07 | Conference committee appointed Flakoll Luick Heckaman | |
2011-04-06 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-04 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-01 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-29 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Received from House | |
2011-02-22 | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0, Emergency clause carried | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0 | |
2011-01-05 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |