ND HB1028 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-15-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the ability of a school district to temporarily transfer excess funds accruing as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic between the general fund and the building fund of the school district; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The ability of a school district to temporarily transfer excess funds accruing as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic between the general fund and the building fund of the school district; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | House | Signed by Governor 03/25 |
2021-03-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-22 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2021-01-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-01-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |