ND 1028 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 83
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-39.2-04.2 and 57-40.2-04.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for materials used in the construction or expansion of a wind-powered electrical generation facility; to provide an effective date; and to provide for retroactive application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A sales and use tax exemption for materials used in the construction or expansion of a wind-powered electrical generation facility; to provide an effective date; and to provide for retroactive application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-01 - House Second reading (Y: 9 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-01HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 83
2017-01-31HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0
2017-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback