ND HB1028 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Agriculture Committee) AN ACT to require that the legislative management continue its study of laws relating to agriculture.
Title
(Agriculture Committee) AN ACT to require that the legislative management continue its study of laws relating to agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2015-03-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-09 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-01-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2015-01-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 0 3 |
2015-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |