ND HB1026 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 49-23-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to survey of areas having underground facilities; to amend and reenact sections 49-23-01, 49-23-03, 49-23-04, 49-23-05, and 49-23-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to location of underground facilities before excavation; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Location of underground facilities before excavation; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2017-03-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-06 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 2 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2017-01-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |