ND HB1025 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of various state departments and institutions; to provide for payment of court-ordered judgments; to provide for a transfer; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of various state departments and institutions; to provide for payment of court-ordered judgments; to provide for a transfer; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 4, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-15 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |