ND HB1025 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Agriculture and Natural Resources) AN ACT to create and enact section 20.1-04-07.1 and chapter 20.1-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to wild turkey hunting licenses for individuals receiving hunting expeditions from a nonprofit organization and authorization for issuance of special allocation hunting licenses; to amend and reenact sections 20.1-02-04, 20.1-04-07, 20.1-08-04.1, 20.1-08-04.2, and 20.1-08-04.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization for issuance of special allocation hunting licenses; to repeal sections 20.1-08-04.8, 20.1-08-04.12, and 20.1-08-04.13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization for issuance of special allocation hunting licenses; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorization for issuance of special allocation hunting licenses; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor 04/18 |
2017-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-13 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-07 | House | Appoint Rep. Porter to replace Rep. M. Ruby on conference committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Roers Schaible Oban |
2017-04-05 | House | Conference committee appointed D. Anderson M. Ruby Mitskog |
2017-04-05 | House | Refused to concur |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2017-01-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-05 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |