ND HB1020 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota state university extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; to provide for a report; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota state university extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; to provide for a report; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Erbele Wanzek Robinson |
2019-04-11 | House | Conference committee appointed Monson Nathe Boe |
2019-04-11 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 14 |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |