ND HB1020 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 05/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 05/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; to amend and reenact sections 4-05.1-05, 4-08-10, 57-39.5-02, and 57-43.1-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to North Dakota state university main research center full-time equivalent positions, North Dakota state university extension service full-time equivalent positions, the transfer of revenue from the farm machinery gross receipts tax, and fuel tax refunds; to authorize the Langdon research extension center to purchase certain land in Cavalier County; to provide for a report to the legislative assembly, the budget section, and the appropriations committees; to provide for transfers; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for exemptions; and to declare an emergency.
Title
North Dakota state university main research center full-time equivalent positions, North Dakota state university extension service full-time equivalent positions, the transfer of revenue from the farm machinery gross receipts tax, and fuel tax refunds; to authorize the Langdon research extension center to purchase certain land in Cavalier County; to provide for a report to the legislative assembly, the budget section, and the appropriations committees; to provide for transfers; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for exemptions; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor 05/13 |
2015-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 13, Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Bowman Erbele O'Connell |
2015-04-14 | House | Conference committee appointed Monson Schmidt Boe |
2015-04-14 | House | Refused to concur |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 3 1 |
2015-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2015-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2015-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |