ND HB1020 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state water commission; to provide exemptions; to provide legislative intent; to amend and reenact section 6-09.5-03 of the North Dakota Century Code and section 54-35-02.7 of the North Dakota Century Code as amended by Senate Bill No. 2233, as approved by the sixty-third legislative assembly, relating to the community water facility loan fund and the water-related topics overview committee; to provide for legislative management reports; to provide for a loan from the Bank of North Dakota; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The community water facility loan fund and the water-related topics overview committee; to provide for legislative management reports; to provide for a loan from the Bank of North Dakota; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/02 |
2013-05-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 39 nays 7 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 17, Emergency clause carried |
2013-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Grindberg Holmberg Robinson |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference committee appointed Carlson Skarphol Williams |
2013-04-18 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 4, Emergency clause carried |
2013-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 2 1 |
2013-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |