ND HB1020 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; to amend and reenact section 4-14.2-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the northern crops council; to provide for transfers; to provide contingent funding; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The northern crops council; to provide for transfers; to provide contingent funding; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/05 | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-21 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Conference committee appointed Bowman Holmberg O'Connell | |
2011-04-13 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-11 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-11 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-08 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-10 | Committee Hearing 01:30 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from House | |
2011-02-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 28, Emergency clause carried | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 6 1 | |
2011-01-31 | Committee Hearing 02:45 | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |