ND 1019 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Veto sustained, yeas 21 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the parks and recreation department; to amend and reenact sections 55-08-06 and 55-08-07.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permits for motor vehicles and parks and the recreation concession revolving fund; to provide a grant to the international peace garden; to authorize the transfer of Dakota institute inventory; to provide exemptions; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits for motor vehicles and parks and the recreation concession revolving fund; to provide a grant to the international peace garden; to authorize the transfer of Dakota institute inventory; to provide exemptions; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Veto sustained, (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Passed over veto, (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Passed over veto, (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateVeto sustained, yeas 21 nays 26
2017-04-27SenateConsideration of Governor's veto
2017-04-26HousePassed over veto, yeas 80 nays 8
2017-04-26HouseConsideration of Governor's veto
2017-04-26HouseSigned by Governor, but item veto 04/25
2017-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-20SenateSigned by President
2017-04-19SenateEmergency clause carried
2017-04-19SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1
2017-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-18SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 20, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-18HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-18HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-10SenateConference committee appointed Sorvaag Krebsbach Mathern
2017-04-07HouseConference committee appointed Streyle Schatz Schmidt
2017-04-07HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-03HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-04-03SenateEmergency clause carried
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1
2017-04-03SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-31SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-23SenateReceived from House
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 7, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 0 2
2017-02-08HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-05HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1019.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0504-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0504-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0504-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0504-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0504-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-35.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-60.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-70.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-76.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-77.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback