ND HB1018 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of commerce; to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-60 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a beyond visual line of sight unmanned aircraft system program; to provide exemptions; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for a transfer; to provide for a report; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A beyond visual line of sight unmanned aircraft system program; to provide exemptions; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for a transfer; to provide for a report; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 20, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Holmberg Bekkedahl Robinson |
2019-04-22 | House | Conference committee appointed Nathe Martinson Boe |
2019-04-22 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-15 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 67 nays 26, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |