ND HB1016 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of adjutant general; to provide for a contingent appropriation; to provide an appropriation to the housing finance agency; to provide for transfers; to provide exemptions; to provide for a budget section report; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of adjutant general; to provide for a contingent appropriation; to provide an appropriation to the housing finance agency; to provide for transfers; to provide exemptions; to provide for a budget section report; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor 05/03 |
2013-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2013-05-01 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Grindberg Holmberg Robinson |
2013-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed Thoreson Brandenburg Glassheim |
2013-04-17 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2013-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2013-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |