ND HB1014 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state industrial commission and the agencies under the management of the industrial commission; to provide legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; to provide a contingent appropriation; to authorize transfers; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state industrial commission and the agencies under the management of the industrial commission; to provide legislative intent; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an appropriation; to provide a contingent appropriation; to authorize transfers; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-22 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-22 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-19 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Conference committee appointed Wardner Erbele Warner | |
2011-04-11 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-07 | Division of amendment | |
2011-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from House | |
2011-02-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 12, Emergency clause carried | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1 | |
2011-01-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |