ND HB1013 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of public instruction, the state library, the school for the deaf, and the North Dakota vision services - school for the blind; to amend and reenact sections 15.1-02-02, 15.1-02-16, 15.1-06-19, and 15.1-27-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the superintendent of public instruction, credentialing, school counselors, and administrative cost-sharing for cooperating districts; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for reports; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The salary of the superintendent of public instruction, credentialing, school counselors, and administrative cost-sharing for cooperating districts; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for reports; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 05/10 |
2021-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 14, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Poolman Holmberg Heckaman |
2021-04-14 | House | Conference committee appointed Monson Sanford Boe |
2021-04-14 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 18 |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 3 1 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |