ND HB1011 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the highway patrol; to provide for a transfer; to provide for legislative intent; and to provide for expense payments to highway patrol officers.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the highway patrol; to provide for a transfer; to provide for legislative intent; and to provide for expense payments to highway patrol officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor 04/29 |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 2 |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Appoint Rep. Boe to replace Rep. Glassheim on conference committee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Wanzek Krebsbach O'Connell |
2015-04-14 | House | Conference committee appointed Vigesaa Kempenich Glassheim |
2015-04-14 | House | Refused to concur |
2015-04-09 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 22 1 0 |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |