ND HB1009 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the agriculture commissioner; to provide for a livestock health permit inspection program; to amend and reenact sections 4-01-19 and 4-01-21 and subdivision d of subsection 1 of section 19-18-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to marketing program revenue, the salary of the agriculture commissioner, and pesticide registration fees; to provide for a legislative council study; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the agriculture commissioner; to provide for a livestock health permit inspection program; to amend and reenact sections 4-01-19 and 4-01-21 and subdivision d of subsection 1 of section 19-18-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to marketing program revenue, the salary of the agriculture commissioner, and pesticide registration fees; to provide for a legislative council study; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by President | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-04 | Second reading passed, y 090 n 004 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-04 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-04 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-04 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-05-04 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-04 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Appointed Holmberg to replace Bowman on conf comm | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Bowman Fischer Krauter | |
2009-04-15 | Appointed Skarphol to replace Martinson on conf comm | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Klein Martinson Onstad | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-13 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-10 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Hearing 03:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 062 nays 030 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 020 n 003 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1009.html |