ND HB1007 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of labor and human rights; and to provide a report.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of labor and human rights; and to provide a report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10 |
2021-03-31 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-25 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6 |
2021-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0 |
2021-01-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |