ND HB1007 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the labor commissioner.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the labor commissioner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-30 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee appointed G. Lee Holmberg Robinson |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference committee appointed Kempenich Hawken Glassheim |
2013-04-22 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 1 |
2013-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 2 0 |
2013-02-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |