ND 1004 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Veto sustained, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state auditor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state auditor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Veto sustained, (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Passed over veto, (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Passed over veto, (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateVeto sustained, yeas 6 nays 41
2017-04-27SenateConsideration of Governor's veto
2017-04-26HousePassed over veto, yeas 74 nays 16
2017-04-26HouseConsideration of Governor's veto
2017-04-26HouseVetoed by Governor
2017-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-20SenateSigned by President
2017-04-20SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-20SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 7
2017-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-10SenateConference committee appointed Oehlke Dever Mathern
2017-04-07HouseConference committee appointed Nathe Brabandt Boehning
2017-04-07HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-03HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-30SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-30SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-29SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-23SenateReceived from House
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5
2017-02-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 0 3
2017-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2017-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-12HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1004.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0489-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0489-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0489-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0489-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0489-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-35.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-58.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-72.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-76.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-77.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback