ND HB1002 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the judicial branch; to amend and reenact sections 27-02-02, 27-02.1-01, 27-02.1-02, 27-02.1-03, 27-02.1-04, 27-02.1-05, 27-02.1-06, 27-02.1-07, 27-02.1-08, 27-02.1-09, and 27-05-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to salaries of justices of the supreme court, the temporary court of appeals, and salaries of district judges; to provide for a report; to provide for a transfer; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a study; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Salaries of justices of the supreme court, the temporary court of appeals, and salaries of district judges; to provide for a report; to provide for a transfer; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a study; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 9, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hogue Dever Grabinger |
2019-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Bellew Beadle Mock |
2019-04-10 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |