ND HB1001 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the governor; to amend and reenact sections 54-07-04 and 54-08-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salaries of the governor and lieutenant governor; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Title
The salaries of the governor and lieutenant governor; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2013-05-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Carlisle Holmberg O'Connell |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference committee appointed Thoreson Brandenburg Glassheim |
2013-04-22 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-03-25 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |