NC S638 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Ch. SL 2013-265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

NC Farm Act of 2013

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC Farm Act of 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-02 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A3 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A2 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A1 Glazier Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-17 Ch. SL 2013-265
2013-07-17 Signed by Gov. 7/17/2013
2013-07-10 Pres. To Gov. 07/10/2013
2013-07-09 Ratified
2013-07-02SenateOrdered Enrolled
2013-07-02SenateConcurred In H/Com Sub
2013-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2013
2013-07-01SenateRec To Concur H Com Sub
2013-06-27HouseOrdered Engrossed
2013-06-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-06-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-06-27HouseAmend Adopted A3
2013-06-27HouseAmend Adopted A2
2013-06-27HouseAmend Adopted A1
2013-06-26HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2013
2013-06-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-06-26HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2013-06-24HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
2013-06-24HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-06-19HouseRef to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B
2013-06-19HouseWithdrawn From Com
2013-06-18HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
2013-06-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2013-05-14HouseRef to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B
2013-05-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-05-13HouseRec From Senate
2013-05-09SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-05-09SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-05-08SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2013-05-08SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-04-03SenateRef To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2013-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-02SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2013&BillID=S638&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S638v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S638v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S638v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S638v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S638v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S638v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S638v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/Senate/HTML/S638v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=309
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1061
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1062
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1063
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1064
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=713

Bill Comments

feedback