NC S513 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Ch. SL 2015-263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

North Carolina Farm Act of 2015

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

North Carolina Farm Act of 2015

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 70 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - M4 Previous Question C RPT Adoption (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 3 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-09-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - A1 Yarborough Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-09-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-30 Ch. SL 2015-263
2015-09-30 Signed by Gov. 9/30/2015
2015-09-30 Pres. To Gov. 09/30/2015
2015-09-29 Ratified
2015-09-29SenateOrdered Enrolled
2015-09-29HouseConf Report Adopted
2015-09-29SenateConf Report Adopted
2015-09-28HousePlaced On Cal For 09/29/2015
2015-09-28HouseConf Com Reported
2015-09-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/29/2015
2015-09-28SenateConf Com Reported
2015-09-28HouseConf Com Appointed
2015-09-28SenateConf Com Appointed
2015-09-28SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2015-09-28SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2015-09-28SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2015-09-28HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2015-09-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2015-09-28HouseAmend Failed A1
2015-09-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2015-09-24HouseAdded to Calendar
2015-09-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-09-24HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2015-09-24HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2015-09-24HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2015-09-23HousePlaced On Cal For 09/24/2015
2015-09-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-09-23HouseReptd Fav
2015-09-23HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-09-23HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2015-09-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Finance
2015-09-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2015-09-15HouseRe-ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Finance
2015-09-15HouseWithdrawn From Com
2015-08-17HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2015-08-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2015-06-10HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-06-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-06-08HouseSerial Referral To Finance Added
2015-05-27HouseRe-ref Com On Agriculture
2015-05-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2015-05-21HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2015-05-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2015-05-20HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2015-05-20SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2015-05-19 Engrossed
2015-05-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2015-05-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2015-05-18SenateAmend Failed A3
2015-05-18SenateAmend Adopted A2
2015-05-18SenateAmend Adopted A1
2015-05-14SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2015-05-14SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-05-13SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-05-13SenateReptd Fav
2015-05-12SenateRe-ref Com On Transportation
2015-05-12SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2015-05-12SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-03-30SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance
2015-03-30SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-03-26SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-03-26SenatePassed 1st Reading
2015-03-25SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2015&BillID=S513&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v7.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v8.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S513v9.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=274
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=275
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=276
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=277
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=285
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1035
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1040
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1041
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=728
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=745
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1062
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1063

Bill Comments

feedback