NC S399 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-01 - Ch. SL 2015-235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Joint Agency Tax Refund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Agency Tax Refund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-01 Ch. SL 2015-235
2015-09-01 Signed by Gov. 9/1/2015
2015-09-01 Pres. To Gov. 09/01/2015
2015-08-31 Ratified
2015-08-27HouseOrdered Enrolled
2015-08-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2015-08-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2015-08-25HousePlaced On Cal For 08/26/2015
2015-08-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-08-20HouseReptd Fav
2015-07-27HouseRef To Com On Finance
2015-07-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2015-07-23HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2015-07-23SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2015-07-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2015-07-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2015-07-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2015-07-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-05-13SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-05-13SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2015-05-13SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-03-26SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance
2015-03-26SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-03-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-03-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2015-03-24SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2015&BillID=S399&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S399v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S399v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S399v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S399v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S399v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S399v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=543
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=983
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=986

Bill Comments

feedback