NC S87 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Reimbursement/Charter Schools
Title
Medicaid Reimbursement/Charter Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] | Sen. Danny Britt [R] |
Sen. Amy Galey [R] | Sen. Michael Lee [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2021-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Budgeting
Charter Schools
Dhhs
Education
Elementary Education
Funding
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Local Government
Medicaid
Poverty
Public
Secondary Education
Social Services
Charter Schools
Dhhs
Education
Elementary Education
Funding
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Local Government
Medicaid
Poverty
Public
Secondary Education
Social Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 218.105 | (n/a) | Citation Text |