NC S862 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Wanda Taylor/Ind. Commission
Title
Confirm Wanda Taylor/Ind. Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-23 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Filed |