NC S853 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Ch. Res 2016-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Ch. Res 2016-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Former Senator Parmon
Title
Honor Former Senator Parmon
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Ch. Res 2016-7 | |
2016-05-25 | Ratified | |
2016-05-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-05-24 | House | Cal Pursuant 32 |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-24 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/24/2016 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1120 (Same As) 2016-05-11 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House