NC S853 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-517
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-517
Summary
Motion for Appropriate Relief/New Requirement.
Title
Motion for Appropriate Relief/New Requirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-517 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Ratified | |
2009-08-03 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-29 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-28 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-02 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-07-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-27 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-04-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S853 |