NC S84 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Walkertown Zoning Authorizations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Walkertown Zoning Authorizations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-03-26SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-21SenatePlaced On Cal For 03/25/2019
2019-03-21SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-03-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-19SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-19SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-04SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H181 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback