NC S84 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Ch. SL 2019-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Ch. SL 2019-61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Walkertown Zoning Authorizations
Title
Walkertown Zoning Authorizations
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Paul Lowe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Ch. SL 2019-61 | |
2019-06-27 | Ratified | |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2019 |
2019-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-06-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-20 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-27 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-26 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 03/25/2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H181 (Same As) 2019-10-31 - Ch. SL 2019-234