NC S829 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-141
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of Appraisal Management Companies
Title
Regulation of Appraisal Management Companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Ch. SL 2010-141 | |
2010-07-22 | Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010 | |
2010-07-02 | Pres. To Gov. 7/2/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Ratified | |
2010-06-30 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2010-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-06-28 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-10 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-08-06 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-28 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-25 | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H716 (Same As) 2009-03-23 - Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance